CA AB2588 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 1.7 (commencing with Section 33329) of Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
College readiness programs: study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33329 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |