CA AB2607 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 727 and 737 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2607 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2607 Skinner By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2607 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2607 Skinner By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2607 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6568.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4856.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4469.) |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 241.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 737 | Amended Code | Citation Text |