CA AB2631 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 361, 3018, 15250, and 19371 of, to amend the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 13282) of Chapter 3 of Division 13 of, to amend and renumber Sections 19382 and 19385 of, to add Section 15250.5 to, and to repeal Sections 13283, 13284, 13285, 13286, 13287, 13288, 13289, 19370, 19380, 19381, 19383, 19384, and 19386 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voting machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2631 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2631 Dababneh By Pavley (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2631 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2631 Dababneh By Pavley (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2631 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 911, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6105.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4459.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4847.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13283 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13284 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13285 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13286 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13287 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13288 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13289 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15250.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 19370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19380 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19381 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19383 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19384 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19386 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |