CA AB2633 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66010.4 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: joint degrees: international institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66010.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |