CA AB2634 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20321 and 22050 of the Public Contract Code, and to add and repeal Section 99155.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Sacramento Regional Transit District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99155.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |