CA AB2642 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 18580) to Chapter 6 of Division 18 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: intimidation.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18580 | New Code | See Bill Text |