CA AB2644 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to teachers.
Title
Teachers: recruitment and retention.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died at Desk. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2644&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2601-2650/ab_2644_bill_20160219_introduced.html |