CA AB2738 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24200.7, 25623, and 25623.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to beverages.
Title
Powdered alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 24200.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25623 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25623.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2738 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2738 |