CA AB2741 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1939.03 and 1939.23 of the Civil Code, relating to rental passenger vehicles.
Title
Rental car companies: electronic surveillance technology.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1939.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |