CA AB2752 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 319, 362.1, 364, 366.21, 366.22, and 366.25 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juvenile court: visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 319 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 362.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |