CA AB2782 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31, 33, 34, 674.9, 1192.9, 1621, 1623, 1625, 1637, 1639, 1729, 1749, 1749.3, 1758.96, 1758.992, 1802.1, 1807.5, 1807.7, 1808, 1810.7, 1811, 1871.7, 1874.86, 12962, 14090, 14090.1, 15054, and 15059.1 of, to add Sections 1742.3, 1807.8, and 1807.9 to, and to repeal Section 1673 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance omnibus.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Wilmer Carter [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Mary Hayashi [D] |
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 2782 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By SOLORIO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2782 Committee on INS. (Solorio) By Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2782 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2782 Committee on INS. (Solorio) By Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2782 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6599.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4782.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-01 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2010-05-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 5). | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-03-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 3. | |
2010-03-03 | Read first time. To print. |