CA AB2809 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4646.5 and 4648 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: regional centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2809 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2809 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and APPR. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5108.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4646.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4646.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4659 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4686.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4686.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |