CA AB2815 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 44272.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Clean Transportation Program: electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44272.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |