CA AB2873 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14031, 14032, 14033, and 14036 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Breaking Barriers to Employment Initiative: grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and J., E.D., & E. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |