CA AB2911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 321 and 1759 of, and to add Sections 322.6 and 345.9 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: public advisor: Independent System Operator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1759 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 322.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 345.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |