CA AB2935 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1785.11.11 of the Civil Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster children: consumer credit reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and HUM. S. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.11.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |