CA AB2973 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1797.234 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency services.
Sponsors
Asm. Gregg Hart [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.M. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.234 | New Code | See Bill Text |