CA AB3059 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1635.1 of, and to add Section 1367.624 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.864 to the Insurance Code, relating to human milk.
Title
Human milk.
Sponsors
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.624 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1635.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.864 | New Code | See Bill Text |