CA AB3090 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116460 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water standards: emergency notification plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Assembly - AB 3090 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |