CA AB3131 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53075 and 88830 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education.
Title
California Career Technical Education Incentive Grant Program: Strong Workforce Program: applicants receiving equity multiplier funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 53075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |