CA AB314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3543.1 of, to add Section 3558.7 to, and to repeal Sections 3505.3, 3518.5, 3524.69, 3569, 71635, and 71821 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Section 99563.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: labor relations: release time.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 314 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB314 Bonta By Monning (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 314 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB314 Bonta By Monning (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 314 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 3480.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2822.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 1862.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3505.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3518.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3524.69 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3543.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3558.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3569 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 71635 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 71821 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99563.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |