CA AB3197 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 100 and 13307 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 3197 Lackey Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |