CA AB3242 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12803.2 of, and to add Section 12815.5 to, the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Commission on Cutting Red Tape: Government Operations Agency.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12803.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12815.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |