CA AB3246 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 565 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: permit to construct: advanced reconductoring: exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 565 | New Code | See Bill Text |