CA AB357 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12050 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: license to carry concealed firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-13 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-01-12 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 12050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |