CA AB376 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2021 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to sharks.
Title
Shark fins.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB376 Fong By Kehoe (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 376 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 376 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2309.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held in committee, reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 1493.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1433.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2021 | New Code | See Bill Text |