CA AB40 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44274.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Air Quality Improvement Program: Clean Vehicle Rebate Project.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.) |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44274.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB40 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB40 |