CA AB42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 825, 1269, 1269a, 1269c, 1275.1, 1277, 1278, 1284, 1295, and 1318 of, to add Sections 1275a, 1275b, 1318.2, and 1318.3 to, to repeal Sections 815a, 1270, 1270.1, 1270.2, 1288, 1319, and 1319.5 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1269b, 1275, 1289, and 1318.1 of, the Penal Code, relating to bail.
Title
Bail: pretrial release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 42 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3097.) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 37. Page 2089.). |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 7.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1270.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1270.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1275.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1277 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1278 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1288 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1318.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1318.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1319 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1319.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 815 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |