CA AB533 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 19900) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to social services, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Area agencies on aging: independent living centers:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HUM. S. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19900 | New Code | See Bill Text |