CA AB577 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 30648 and 130265 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Rail construction: County of Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - AB 577 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB577 Nazarian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - AB 577 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB577 Nazarian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - AB 577 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5694.). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3929.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3658.) |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 13). |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130265 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 30648 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |