CA AB61 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 790 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juvenile crime: deferred entry of judgment.
Sponsors
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 61 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 61 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1827.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |
2009-03-17 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |
2008-12-09 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 790 | Amended Code | Citation Text |