CA AB624 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 215) of Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, and to add Sections 216.5 and 217 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil and student health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil and student health: identification cards: sexual assault hotline and reproductive health care telephone numbers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 624 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB624 Gabriel et al. By Rubio (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 624 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3018.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2458.).
2019-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2019-06-03SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 1574.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 1).
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-03-18AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code215Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code216.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code217New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback