CA AB637 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43013.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Zero-emission vehicles: fleet owners: rental vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Assembly - AB 637 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3930.) |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43013.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |