CA AB646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8589.45 to the Government Code, relating to rental property disclosures.
Title
Rental property: disclosures: flood hazard areas: areas of potential flooding.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 646 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB646 Kalra et al. By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 646 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB646 Kalra et al. By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 646 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3131.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2579.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 2081.) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2080.) |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1886.) |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 9). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69509.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8589.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8589.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8589.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |