CA AB648 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 104755.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to oral health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Health care access demonstration project grants: Virtual
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 648 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 648 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1714.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15438.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104755.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |