CA AB714 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12020.1 of the Penal Code, relating to composite knuckles.
Title
Composite knuckles.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB714 Feuer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 714 FEUER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 714 FEUER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1365.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 12020.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |