CA AB731 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 807, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1374.21, 1385.01, 1385.02, 1385.045, and 1385.07 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1385.03 of, and to add Section 1385.046 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10181, 10181.2, 10181.3, 10181.7, and 10199.1 of, and to add Section 10181.31 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: rate review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 731 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB731 Kalra et al. By Pan (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 731 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 807, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 3140.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2560.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 1942.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback