CA AB734 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 124242.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to youth athletics.
Title
Youth tackle football.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 10). |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 124242.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |