CA AB749 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 1002.5) to Title 14 of Part 2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Settlement agreements: restraints in trade.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 749 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB749 Mark Stone et al. By Durazo (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - Date (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 749 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB749 Mark Stone et al. By Durazo (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - Date (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 749 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 3031.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2462.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 19. Page 1481.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |