CA AB792 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5240 and 9250 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Board of directors: investment standards.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB792 Chiu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 792 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 792 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1548.). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1477.) |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 9250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |