CA AB8 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to juvenile justice, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Division of Juvenile Justice: facilities: closures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-10 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |