CA AB802 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1281.96 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to consumer arbitration.
Title
Private arbitration companies: disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 802 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB802 Wieckowski By Monning (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 802 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 802 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB802 Wieckowski By Monning (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 802 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 802 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 870, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6210.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4551.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3717.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3681.) |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Wieckowski. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Wieckowski. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1553.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 1378.) |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |