CA AB805 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13288 and 13442 of, and to add Section 13289.5 to, the Water Code, relating to water quality, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Sewer service: disadvantaged communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Assembly - AB 805 Arambula Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3968.). |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13289.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13442 | Amended Code | Citation Text |