CA AB882 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2153 and 11105 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter registration and recall elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 882 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB882 Gordon By Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 882 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB882 Gordon By Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 882 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6181.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6182.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4556.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1118.) |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |