CA AB90 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 186.2 and 186.8 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking: minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-31 - Assembly - AB 90 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 90 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 90 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2716.). | |
2011-08-29 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2082.). | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1637.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-01-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |
2011-01-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 186.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |