CA AB903 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 32499.6) to Division 23 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care districts.
Title
Los Medanos Community Healthcare District.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-08 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-08-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 903 Frazier Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 903 Frazier Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1357.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 32499.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |