CA AB92 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7201 and 10261 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: payment.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB92 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 92 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 92 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10261 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 7201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |