CA AB93 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Personal income taxes: earned income tax credit: young child tax credit: federal individual taxpayer identification number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 93 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB93 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 93 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB93 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 93 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4963.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3855.). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1174.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |