CA AB948 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4658.5 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: supplemental job displacement
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-01-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |