CA AB990 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13277 to, and to add and repeal Section 13276.5 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water quality: waste discharge requirements: infill housing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 990 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3946.) |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3931.) |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13276.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13277 | New Code | See Bill Text |